Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/26/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/30/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/01/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/01/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/21/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/21/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/23/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/29/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/04/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/11/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/22/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/13/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/15/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/06/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/25/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/18/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/22/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/28/2010