Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/30/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/30/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/30/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/31/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/31/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/02/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/22/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/29/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/11/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/21/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/23/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/24/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/30/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/05/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 10/15/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/20/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/04/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/23/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/12/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/26/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/03/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/13/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/27/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2010