Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/26/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/26/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/20/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/08/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/27/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/08/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 12/07/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/11/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/09/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/16/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/24/2010