Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/31/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/02/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/29/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/10/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/02/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/24/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/13/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/26/2010