Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/01/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/21/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/21/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/23/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 08/03/2009