Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/01/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/13/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/22/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/02/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/16/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/28/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/10/2010