Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/23/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/23/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/02/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/22/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/09/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/09/2009