Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/28/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/18/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/18/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/18/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/16/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/23/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/10/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/14/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/22/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/30/2009