Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/10/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/18/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/23/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/05/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/03/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/22/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/24/2010