Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/20/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/22/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/18/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/19/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/21/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/03/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/08/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/08/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/23/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/06/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/07/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/20/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/21/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/27/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/03/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/10/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/10/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/30/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/05/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/05/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/21/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/26/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 11/18/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/20/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/20/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/10/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/11/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/29/2010