Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/02/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/21/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/22/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/23/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/29/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/29/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/05/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/06/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/06/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/06/2009