Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/03/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/03/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/24/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/24/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/18/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/15/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/23/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/29/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/29/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/21/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/28/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/03/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/27/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/01/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/01/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/02/2010