Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/05/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/13/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/02/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/09/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/06/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/05/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/21/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/22/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/29/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/06/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/06/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/13/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/15/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/21/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/20/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/17/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/21/2010
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/23/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/24/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/15/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/20/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/15/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/15/2010