Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/20/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/21/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/23/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/28/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/29/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/29/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/04/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/12/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/18/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/01/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/01/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/02/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/03/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/08/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/13/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/13/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/14/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/16/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/29/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 08/04/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/09/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/09/2009