There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Pedestrian Safety Enhancement Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pedestrian Safety Enhancement Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Pedestrian Safety Enhancement Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Pedestrian Safety Enhancement Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of Transportation to study and establish a motor vehicle safety standard that provides for a means of alerting blind and other pedestrians of motor vehicle operation.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-373. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010Presented to President.
12/16/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 30 (Roll no. 640).(text: CR 12/15/2010 H8411)
12/09/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8690)
12/09/2010Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8690)
04/21/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/04/2011Became Public Law No: 111-373. (TXT | PDF)
01/04/2011Signed by President.
12/28/2010SenatePresented to President.
12/16/2010-2:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2010-2:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 30 (Roll no. 640). (text: CR 12/15/2010 H8411)
12/16/2010-1:42pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8543)
12/15/2010-5:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/15/2010-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 841.
12/15/2010-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8411-8412)
12/15/2010-5:30pmHouseMr. Barrow moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2010HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
12/13/2010HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
12/13/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/13/2010-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8690)
12/09/2010SenateS.Amdt.4750 Amendment SA 4750 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2010SenateS.Amdt.4750 Amendment SA 4750 proposed by Senator Wyden for Senator Kerry. (consideration: CR S8690; text: CR S8690) In the nature of a substitute.
12/09/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8690)
12/09/2010SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8690)
04/21/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
04/21/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4519)

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/21/2009 Referred to
12/09/2010 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce12/13/2010 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/13/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.841. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-373 (01/04/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 9, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pedestrian Safety Enhancement Act of 2010 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation to initiate a rulemaking to promulgate a phased-in motor vehicle safety standard: (1) establishing performance requirements for an alert sound that allows blind and other pedestrians to detect a nearby electric or hybrid vehicle operating below the cross-over speed, if any; and (2) requiring such vehicles to provide an alert sound conforming to established standard requirements. Prescribes requirements for such standards. Prohibits requiring either driver or pedestrian activation of the alert sound.

Directs the Secretary to study and report to Congress on whether there is a safety need to apply such standard to conventional motor vehicles.

Requires the allocation of certain funds to the Administrator of the National Highway Transportation Safety Administration (NHTSA) to carry out this rulemaking.