Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/05/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/05/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/21/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/10/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/04/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/15/2010