Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/21/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/24/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/24/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/24/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/24/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/24/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/30/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/30/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/30/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/30/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/30/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/30/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/30/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/30/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/30/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/30/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/30/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/30/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/30/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/04/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/04/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/04/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/04/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/04/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/11/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/11/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/11/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/12/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/13/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/13/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/18/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/21/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/21/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/21/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/02/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/04/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/04/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/16/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/25/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/07/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/09/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/20/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/21/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/27/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/03/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/04/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/05/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/08/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/08/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/10/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/11/2009