Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/22/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/23/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/07/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/28/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/28/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/10/2009