Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/12/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/12/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/21/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/27/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/27/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/28/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/28/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/29/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 08/06/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/06/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/09/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/10/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/15/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/15/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/01/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/05/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/17/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/18/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/18/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/19/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/02/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/14/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/15/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/23/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/12/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/15/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/04/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/20/2010