Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/22/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/22/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/11/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/08/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/01/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/05/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/08/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/13/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/15/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/09/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/20/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/28/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/23/2010