Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/23/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/04/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/07/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/04/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/17/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/17/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/17/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/18/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/18/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/18/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/19/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/22/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/22/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/22/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/23/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/23/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/06/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/13/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/14/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 08/03/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/04/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/05/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/06/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/07/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/08/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/08/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/10/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/10/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/14/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/21/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/23/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/29/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/29/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/01/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/05/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/05/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/06/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/07/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/07/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/07/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 10/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/08/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/08/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/08/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/08/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/13/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/13/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/13/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/13/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/13/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/13/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/13/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/13/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/13/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/13/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/13/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/13/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/14/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/14/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/14/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/14/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/14/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 10/19/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/19/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/19/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/19/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/02/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/19/2009