Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/29/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/29/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/29/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/29/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/29/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/30/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/04/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/04/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/04/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/05/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/05/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/05/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/11/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/11/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/11/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/11/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/11/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/11/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/11/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/12/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/13/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/14/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/19/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/20/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/21/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/02/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/04/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/04/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/09/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/16/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/19/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/25/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/07/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/13/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/16/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/27/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/29/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/29/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/05/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/06/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/16/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/16/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/21/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/20/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/28/2010