Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/29/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/27/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/09/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/05/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/23/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/30/2010