Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/30/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/06/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/09/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/09/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/17/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/08/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/09/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/21/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/30/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/31/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 08/05/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/16/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/21/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/08/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/19/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/10/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/15/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/18/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 01/22/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/23/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/25/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/01/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/03/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/12/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/10/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/11/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/19/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/27/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/27/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/09/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/14/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/16/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/16/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/29/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/22/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/16/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/14/2010