Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/01/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/12/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/12/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/12/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/13/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/14/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/14/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/14/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/14/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/14/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/14/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/15/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/15/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/15/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/15/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/16/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/16/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/20/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/20/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/20/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/20/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/20/2009