Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/13/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 01/14/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/15/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/22/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 01/22/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/27/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 01/28/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/29/2009