Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/04/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/04/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/04/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/04/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/05/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/10/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/15/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/09/2010