Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/11/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/12/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/24/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/08/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/01/2009