Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/14/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/10/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/19/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/20/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/03/2010