Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/07/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/13/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/13/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/02/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/07/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/11/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/08/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/24/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/24/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/09/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/14/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/05/2010