There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect girls in developing countries through the prevention of child marriage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/16/2010Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 241 - 166 (Roll no. 645).
12/01/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/26/2010Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/29/2010 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-344.
05/06/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/16/2010-7:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 241 - 166 (Roll no. 645).
12/16/2010-7:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8551-8552)
12/15/2010-8:04pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/15/2010-7:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House continued with further debate on S. 987.
12/15/2010-7:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 987.
12/15/2010-7:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8471-8474; text as received in House: CR H8471-8472)
12/15/2010-7:42pmHouseMr. Berman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/02/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/02/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/02/2010-10:14amHouseReceived in the House.
12/01/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/2010SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/2010SenateS.Amdt.4725 Amendment SA 4725 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/01/2010SenateS.Amdt.4725 Amendment SA 4725 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S8355) In the nature of a substitute.
12/01/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8353-8355; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S8353-8354)
10/26/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637.
10/26/2010SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/29/2010 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-344.
09/21/2010SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/06/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5232-5236)

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/07/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/11/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/12/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/18/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/21/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/04/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/19/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/08/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/09/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/15/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/14/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/21/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/22/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/22/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/01/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/22/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/11/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/12/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 05/13/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/24/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/07/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/21/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/02/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/03/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/21/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/21/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/06/2009 Referred to
09/21/2010 Markup by
10/26/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-344
House Foreign Affairs12/02/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.987. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/01/2010)

International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2010 - (Sec. 3) Defines "child marriage" as the marriage of a girl or boy not yet the minimum age for marriage stipulated in law in the country in which the girl or boy is a resident, or where there is no such law, under the age of 18.

(Sec. 4) Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) child marriage is a violation of human rights and its prevention and elimination should be a U.S. foreign policy goal; and (2) expanding educational opportunities for girls, economic opportunities for women, and reducing maternal and child mortality are critical to achieving the Millennium Development Goals and U.S. global health and development objectives, including efforts to prevent HIV/AIDS.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes the President to provide assistance, including through multilateral, nongovernmental, and faith-based organizations, to prevent child marriage in developing countries and to promote the educational, health, economic, social, and legal empowerment of girls and women. Sets forth priority assistance criteria.

Directs the President to establish a multi-year strategy to prevent child marriage and promote the empowerment of girls at risk of child marriage in developing countries, and should include addressing the unique needs, vulnerabilities, and potential of girls under age 18 in developing countries. Sets forth strategy elements.

(Sec. 6) Expresses the sense of Congress that the President and all relevant agencies should collect and make available data on: (1) the incidence of child marriage in countries that receive U.S. foreign or development assistance where the practice of child marriage is prevalent; and (2) the impact of the incidence of child marriage and the age at marriage on progress in meeting key development goals.

(Sec. 7) Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to require that Department of State country reports on human rights practices include a description of the status of child marriage for each country in which child marriage is prevalent.