Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/07/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/11/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/12/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/18/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/21/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/04/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/19/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/08/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/09/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/15/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/14/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/21/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/22/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/22/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/01/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/22/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/11/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/12/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/13/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/24/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/07/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/21/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 08/02/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/03/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/21/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/21/2010