Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/07/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/21/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/25/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/06/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/08/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/09/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 07/09/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/30/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/03/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/04/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/06/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/06/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/22/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/13/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/18/2009