Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/30/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/01/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/23/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/23/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/28/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/12/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/12/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/19/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/01/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/01/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/02/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/02/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/03/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/04/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/08/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/09/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/14/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/16/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/16/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 08/05/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/16/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/08/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/10/2009