There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution apologizing for the enslavement and racial segregation of African Americans.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/18/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(text: CR S6761-6762)
06/11/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
06/18/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/18/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/18/2009-6:26pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/18/2009SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S6761-6762)
06/18/2009SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6761-6768)
06/11/2009SenateSubmitted in the Senate and ordered held at desk by unanimous consent. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6568-6569)

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/16/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/16/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/16/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/16/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/16/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/17/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/17/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/18/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/18/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/18/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/18/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/18/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/18/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/18/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/18/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.26.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.26. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/18/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Acknowledges the fundamental injustice, cruelty, brutality, and inhumanity of slavery and Jim Crow laws.

Apologizes to African-Americans on behalf of the people of the United States for the wrongs committed against them and their ancestors who suffered under slavery and Jim Crow laws.

Expresses Congress's recommitment to the principle that all people are created equal and endowed with inalienable rights to life, liberty, and the pursuit of happiness, and calls on all people of the United States to work toward eliminating racial prejudices, injustices, and discrimination from our society.

Declares that nothing in this resolution authorizes, supports, or serves as a settlement of any claim against the United States.