Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/11/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/16/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/16/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/16/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/16/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/16/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/17/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/17/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/18/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/18/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/18/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/18/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/18/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/18/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/18/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/18/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/18/2009