Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/30/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/02/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/22/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/21/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/09/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/12/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/13/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/13/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/14/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/16/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/20/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/28/2010