There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution providing for the acceptance of a statue of Helen Keller, presented by the people of Alabama.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/30/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10085)
09/23/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9758; text as passed Senate: CR S9758; text of measure as introduced: CR S9750)
09/23/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/01/2009SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
09/30/2009-11:46amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2009-11:46amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10085)
09/30/2009-11:30amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 41.
09/30/2009-11:30amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10085-10087)
09/30/2009-11:30amHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
09/24/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
09/24/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/24/2009-10:10amHouseReceived in the House.
09/23/2009SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9758; text as passed Senate: CR S9758; text of measure as introduced: CR S9750)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 09/23/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration09/24/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/30/2009)

Accepts in the name of the United States the statue of Helen Keller, furnished by the people of Alabama for placement in the Capitol.

Tenders the thanks of Congress to the people of Alabama for providing this commemoration of one of Alabama's most eminent persons.

Authorizes the state of Alabama to use the Rotunda of the Capitol on October 7, 2009, for a presentation ceremony for the statue accepted under this Act.