There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of March 20 as a National Day of Recognition for Long-Term Care Physicians.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7771-7772)
09/29/2010Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/02/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
11/15/2010-6:17pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/15/2010-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/30/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2010SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7771-7772)
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4690 Amendment SA 4690 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4690 Amendment SA 4690 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Chambliss. (consideration: CR S7771; text: CR S7771) To change the date.
09/29/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7771-7772)
09/29/2010SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/02/2010SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S954)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/02/2010 Referred to
09/29/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.52. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/2010)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of, and the designation of March 20, 2010 as, a National Day of Recognition for Long-Term Care Physicians.