Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/07/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/23/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/30/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 08/05/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/13/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/14/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/16/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/20/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 09/20/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/20/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/29/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/29/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/29/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/15/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/17/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/18/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/18/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/07/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/14/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/15/2010