There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution recognizing the United States national interest in helping to prevent and mitigate acts of genocide and other mass atrocities against civilians, and supporting and encouraging efforts to develop a whole of government approach to prevent and mitigate such acts.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/22/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11054-11057; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S11054-11056; text as passed Senate: CR S11056-11057)
12/21/2010Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
08/05/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
12/23/2010Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Action By: Senate
12/22/2010Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11054-11057; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S11054-11056; text as passed Senate: CR S11056-11057)
Action By: Senate
12/21/2010Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722.
Action By: Senate
12/21/2010Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/14/2010Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/05/2010Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6909-6910)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations08/05/2010 Referred to
12/14/2010 Markup by
12/21/2010 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.71.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.71. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/22/2010)

Recommits to honor the memory of the victims of the Holocaust as well as the victims of all past genocides and mass atrocities.

Affirms that it is in the national interest and aligned with the values of the United States to work with international partners to prevent and mitigate future genocides and mass atrocities.

Supports the establishment of an interagency policy committee and a National Security Council position dedicated to the prevention of genocide and other mass atrocities.