Text: S.Con.Res.75 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

S. CON. RES. 75


Agreed to December 1, 2010

AT THE SECOND SESSION

Begun and held at the City of Washington on Tuesday,
the fifth day of January, two thousand and ten

      Whereas John Fitzgerald Kennedy was elected to the United States House of Representatives and served from January 3, 1947, to January 3, 1953, until he was elected by the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to the Senate where he served from January 3, 1953, to December 22, 1960;

      Whereas on November 8, 1960, John Fitzgerald Kennedy was elected as the 35th President of the United States; and

      Whereas on January 20, 1961, President Kennedy was sworn in as President of the United States and delivered his inaugural address at 12:51pm, a speech that served as a clarion call to service for the Nation: Now, therefore, be it

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring),

    SECTION 1. Use of the rotunda of the Capitol for an event honoring President Kennedy.

    The rotunda of the United States Capitol is authorized to be used on January 20, 2011, for a ceremony in honor of the 50th anniversary of the inaugural address of President John F. Kennedy. Physical preparations for the conduct of the ceremony shall be carried out in accordance with such conditions as may be prescribed by the Architect of the Capitol.

    Attest:









    Secretary of the Senate  

    Attest:









    Clerk of the House of Representatives