Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/07/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/28/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/07/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/14/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/29/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/21/2010