Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/09/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/16/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/16/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/16/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/17/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/17/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/17/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/18/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/18/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/18/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/18/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/19/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/22/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/22/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/23/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/23/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/23/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/23/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/23/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/23/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/24/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/24/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/07/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/07/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/07/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/07/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/07/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/07/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/08/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/08/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/09/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/10/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/13/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/13/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/13/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/13/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/16/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/16/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/22/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/22/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/22/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/23/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/23/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/23/2009