There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution disapproving a rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to the endangerment finding and the cause or contribute findings for greenhouse gases under section 202(a) of the Clean Air Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/07/2010Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged pursuant to chapter 8, title 5, U.S.C.
01/21/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
06/10/2010Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 53. Record Vote Number: 184. (consideration: CR S4836)
Action By: Senate
06/10/2010Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S4789-4836)
Action By: Senate
06/07/2010Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418.
Action By: Senate
06/07/2010Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged pursuant to chapter 8, title 5, U.S.C.
Action By: Senate
01/21/2010Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/21/2010
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/21/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/21/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 01/21/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/21/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 01/26/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works01/21/2010 Referred to
06/07/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.26. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/21/2010)

Disapproves the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) on December 15, 2009, relating to the endangerment finding and the cause or contribute findings for greenhouse gases under the Clean Air Act.