Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/05/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/05/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/05/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/05/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/05/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/05/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/06/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/10/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/10/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/10/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/13/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/13/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/13/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/18/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/18/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/18/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/18/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/18/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/19/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/19/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/19/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/19/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/19/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/19/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/19/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/20/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/20/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/24/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/24/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/24/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/24/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/24/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/25/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/25/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/25/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/26/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/26/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/26/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/26/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/27/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/27/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/27/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/27/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/27/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/27/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/28/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/28/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/28/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/07/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/07/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/08/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/08/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/08/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/08/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/08/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/09/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/09/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 06/10/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/15/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/15/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/15/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/23/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/23/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/23/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/30/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/30/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/22/2010