There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Mediation Board relating to representation election procedures.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/22/2010Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition, pursuant to 5.U.S.C. 802(c).
05/11/2010Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/23/2010Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 239.
Action By: Senate
09/23/2010Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7370-7383)
Action By: Senate
09/22/2010Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
Action By: Senate
09/22/2010Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition, pursuant to 5.U.S.C. 802(c).
Action By: Senate
05/11/2010Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/11/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/11/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/12/2010
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/12/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/13/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/13/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/13/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/09/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/14/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/14/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/16/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/17/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/13/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/13/2010
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/13/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/13/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/11/2010 Referred to
09/22/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.30. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/11/2010)

Disapproves and nullifies the rule submitted by the National Mediation Board relating to representation election procedures.