Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/11/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/11/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/11/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/12/2010
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/12/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/13/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/13/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/13/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/09/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/2010
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/14/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/14/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/16/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/17/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/13/2010
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/13/2010
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/13/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/13/2010