Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/26/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/05/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/05/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/05/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/05/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/05/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/12/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/25/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/25/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/05/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/09/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/16/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/17/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/30/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/31/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/31/2009