Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/08/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/13/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/15/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/16/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/16/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/20/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/21/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/28/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/08/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/08/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/10/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/29/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/03/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/03/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/03/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/09/2009